KARIMIA INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE TEACHING OF RELIGION OF ISLAM. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18, IN PARTICULAR MUSLIMS BY ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND SOCIAL WELFARE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 December 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TARIQ MOHAMMED NASIR | Chair | 01 December 1998 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED YOUNAS | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Tariq Nasir BSC, DMS | Trustee | 01 December 1998 |
|
|||||
MOHAMMED SULEMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
FAZLE RABBI KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.86k | £16.11k | £21.10k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.86k | £16.11k | £21.10k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 APRIL 2001.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE TEACHING OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM AS PRACTISED BY THOSE DEFINED IN CLAUSE A ABOVE AND THE OBSERVANCES THAT SERVE TO PROMOTE AND MANIFEST IT. 2) TO ADVANCE OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18, IN PARTICULAR MUSLIMS, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE, INCLUDING FULL-TIME ISLAMIC EDUCATION. 3) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
512-514 BERRIDGE ROAD WEST
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 5JU
- Phone:
- 01158415807
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window