MADRASA TUL IMAM MUHAMMAD ZAKARIYA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Madrasatul Imam Muhammad Zakaria is an independent educational institute for pupils. It aims to foster an awareness within students about their surroundings and society in an environment that is both conductive to their learning and moral welfare. The institute aims to install within its pupils with a sense of citizenship and prospensity for human welfare, values, plurality and multiculturalism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income includes £42,596 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 20 September 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZAQIR HUSSEIN PATEL | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MOHMED IMRAN YAKUB DESAI | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
BILAL NAKHUDA | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SAID AHMED | Trustee |
|
||||||
IBRAHIM OUNIA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.83k | £108.14k | £140.23k | £133.80k | £144.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.03k | £112.69k | £125.13k | £106.46k | £124.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.89k | £12.88k | £36.97k | £38.96k | £42.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 January 2024 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 January 2024 | 187 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 DECEMBER 2000 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF SUNNI ISLAM WHICH IS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE JURISTIC INTERPRETATION OF THE GRAND MUFTI OF DAROOL-ULOOM AL-ARABIYYA AL-ISLAMIYYA, HOLCOMBE HALL, HOLCOMBE, BURY, LANCASHIRE. 2. TO FURTHER ISLAMIC EDUCATION INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF THE ARABIC LANGUAGE. 3. TO HELP EDUCATE YOUNG MUSLIMS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 4. TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ANY CHARITABLE SERVICES.
Area of benefit
LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Imam Muhammad Zakariya School
Leonard House
2 Bairstow Street
PRESTON
PR1 3TN
- Phone:
- 01772 881 968
- Email:
- info@imz.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window