ASIAN SOCIAL & HUMANITARIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The following ongoing activities: Prayer session for the local Muslim Community daily five times; Elderly and pensioner club; Job club for local unemployed people i.e. CV writing, interview skills & the job search. Sports and recreational activities for Young people indoor and outdoor games; Homework tuition and religious education classes, community cohesion, and diversity & inclusion project.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Sadruzzaman Khan | Chair | 10 October 2021 |
|
|||||
KAMRUL HASA KHAN | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamal Ahmed Khan | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
AYSHA BEGUM | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MD ANISUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|||||
MIRZA AFSOR BAIG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.34k | £79.49k | £45.61k | £41.51k | £64.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.27k | £64.23k | £47.20k | £51.06k | £66.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.72k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED 21 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE OF EDUCATION AMONG MEMBERS OF BLACK AND ETHNIC MINORITIES COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR WITHIN THE LONDON AREA, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY MOTHER TONGUE CLASSES FOR STUDENTS UNDERACHIEVING IN MAINSTREAM EDUCATION. 2. THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AMONG MEMBERS OF BME COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE UK AND IN PARTICULAR THE LONDON AREA, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UK AND OVERSEA'S
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 STATION ROAD
LONDON
E12 5BP
- Phone:
- 07983520141
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window