Financial history TALL SHIPS (WALES) TRUST

Charity number: 1088176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.16k £17.35k £23.79k £53.61k £31.29k
Total expenditure £18.17k £23.70k £22.30k £38.56k £17.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k N/A £32.87k £25.00k