Financial history THE WILLIAM AND GRACE TRUST

Charity Number: 1085927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £20.51k £18.86k £23.96k £29.31k £28.45k
Total expenditure £2.94k £3.65k £26.42k £12.00k £19.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A