THE LIONEL BART FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity invites applications for bursary awards through various theatre schools. The applications are reviewed by the trustees who ensure that they are in accordance with the charity's objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 April 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Emma Kendall | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PRUSKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MICHAEL ROTH COHEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MALCOLM WEBBER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.13k | £51.57k | £66.94k | £20.99k | £38.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.23k | £71.56k | £46.26k | £70.89k | £26.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 April 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 08 April 2022 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE FUNDING OF SCHOLARSHIPS FOR PROSPECTIVE ACTORS, COMPOSERS, LYRICISTS, BOOKWRITERS, PLAYWRIGHTS, DESIGNERS, CHOREOGRAPHERS, DIRECTORS AND THE PERSONS WHO WISH TO MAKE THE THEATRE THEIR CAREER BUT WHO CANNOT AFFORD THE FEES OF THE NECESSARY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION TO ENABLE THEM TO ACHIEVE THIS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLINTONS
55 DRURY LANE
LONDON
WC2B 5SQ
- Phone:
- 02073796080
- Email:
- jc@clintons.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window