CUMBRIA FAMILY SUPPORT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide support for disadvantaged families with children up to eighteen years old. Volunteers visit their allocated families in their own home on a regular basis providing friendship, support & practical assistance. Group activities for parents & children are run in different venues & often in conjunction with other agencies. We also run a Child Contact Centre for absent parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £72,000 from 2 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 28 March 2001: Standard registration
- EAST CUMBRIA FAMILY SUPPORT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Renouf | Chair | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Richard Guy Smith | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Hall | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Walter McCulloch | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mary Edwards | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dennis Spencer Hill | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Anne Metcalf | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|||||
KAREN MORLAND | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER TAYLOR HARRINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.67k | £289.33k | £390.21k | £377.64k | £327.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.24k | £283.00k | £349.25k | £320.79k | £405.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £72.00k | £72.00k | N/A | £72.00k | £72.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.75k | N/A | £72.00k | £50.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JANUARY 2001 AS AMENDED ON 2 AUGUST 2010. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE FAMILIES IN CUMBRIA WITH CHILDREN UP TO EIGHTEEN YEARS OLD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
CUMBRIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OFFICE
MARDALE ROAD
PENRITH
CUMBRIA
CA11 9EH
- Phone:
- 01768593102
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window