LEIGHTON ( MONTGOMERYSHIRE) VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity provides facilities for sporting, educational and leisure activities for the local community and beyond, including fencing, badminton, short mat bowling, dancing, yoga, children's parties and community social events. The Hall is also used during term time for sporting, educational and social activities by Leighton C P School and PTA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 April 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
Governance
- 03 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Neil Williams | Chair | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Hawes | Trustee | 08 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ORR | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE WALTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL HARRIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
John Grant Markwick | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELISABETH GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/04/2020 | 07/04/2021 | 07/04/2022 | 07/04/2023 | 07/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.87k | £33.77k | £15.52k | £21.68k | £22.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.34k | £9.15k | £17.40k | £13.88k | £21.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.90k | £21.90k | £4.00k | £6.98k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 April 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 April 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED 5 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEIGHTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR ( BUT WITHOUT RESTRICTION UPON THE GENERALITY OF SUCH OBJECTS) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THEIR USE, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS , LECTURES OR CLASSES AND FOR ALL FORMS OF RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF EDUCATION OR SOCIAL WELFARE , AND TO PROMOTE THE ASSOCIATION OF LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA GENERALLY IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ACHIEVE THOSE OBJECTS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
THE AREA WITHIN A RADIUS OF 3 KM FROM HOLY TRINITY CHURCH, LEIGHTON, WELSHPOOL IN THE COUNTY OF POWYS, SO FAR AS THAT AREA LIES TO THE EAST OF THE RIVER SEVERN
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Redwood Close
Leighton
WELSHPOOL
SY21 8JH
- Phone:
- 07854103058
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window