POURCHISTA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to ensure the survival of Zoroastrianism by supporting new initiatives towards this end. We provide 2 safe centres: for young Zoroastrian women to learn skills from specialist teachers enabling them to earn an income while maintaining solidarity within our ever-dwindling community; a senior citizens day centre with amenities for exercise, medical checks, meals and traditional passtimes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 March 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Iran
Governance
- 11 May 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAHIN BEKHRADNIA | Chair |
|
||||||||
PARVANEH KHOSRAVI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ARMITA FOROUHAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/03/2016 | 20/03/2017 | 20/03/2018 | 20/03/2019 | 20/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.83k | £140 | £140 | £152 | £173 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.00k | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 20 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 20 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Annual return | 20 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days | |
Annual return | 20 March 2020 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
A). TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF YOUNG ZOROASTRIANS B). TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG ZOROASTRIANS C). TO ADVANCE THE ZOROASTRIAN RELIGION PARTICULARLY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE ALL BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO THE POURCHISITA INSTITUTE IN YAZD
Area of benefit
YAZD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD MILL
LIDSTONE
CHIPPING NORTON
OX7 4HL
- Phone:
- 01608677537
- Email:
- shahinbekhradnia@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window