BRIDGE BUILDERS CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bridge Builders Christian Trust - connecting children with faith, hope and love A team of paid staff and volunteers working in partnership with primary schools and churches in Stevenage and the surrounding area to provide: Activities which encourage children to explore faith. Early prevention mentoring and pastoral support for vulnerable children. Resources to equip those who lead them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £800 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 October 2001: Standard registration
- BRIDGE BUILDERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Charles George Woodrow | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew Brown | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret MacCarthy | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gordon | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Penelope Paton | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Helen Clare Gale | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.92k | £36.89k | £37.75k | £40.14k | £40.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.71k | £38.54k | £41.24k | £44.31k | £34.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.71k | £400 | £800 | £800 | £800 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN HERTFORDSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN THE SAID COUNTY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (C) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES, PARTICULARLY CHILDREN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS IN THE SAID COUNTY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE OR SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bridge Builders Christian Trust
United Reformed Church
Cuttys Lane
STEVENAGE
Hertfordshire
SG1 1UL
- Phone:
- 01438314314
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window