THE SHREWSBURY & NEWPORT CANALS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and undertaking the restoration of the Shrewsbury Canal and the Newport branch of the Shropshire Union Canal to good and navigable order, including associated structures and buildings, for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 02 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERNARD CHARLES JONES | Chair | 26 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Philip Tarrant | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John William Snell | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ardian Rowberry | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vaughan Welch | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Philip Michael Jones | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Heather | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Metcalfe Stevens | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|||||
John Myers | Trustee | 15 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHERREL GILLIAN FIKEIS | Trustee | 20 May 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.98k | £103.23k | £86.21k | £171.73k | £44.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.07k | £17.35k | £19.98k | £25.67k | £31.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2000 as amended on 03 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION OF THE SHREWSBURY CANAL BETWEEN SHREWSBURY AND WAPPENSHALL JUNCTION IN THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE AND OF THE NEWPORT BRANCH OF THE SHROPSHIRE UNION CANAL BETWEEN WAPPENSHALL JUNCTION AND NORBURY JUNCTION IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE TO GOOD AND NAVIGABLE ORDER AND TO PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE CANALS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (2) TO PROMOTE THE FULLEST USE OF THE CANALS BY ALL FORMS OF WATERBORNE TRAFFIC AND FOR ALL FORMS OF WATER-RELATED COMMERCIAL, LOCAL AMENITY, TOURIST AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (3) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND USE OF THE CANALS AND WATERWAYS AND OF THE CANALS IN PARTICULAR.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS FOR AREA OF BENEFIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 ARSCOTT
PONTESBURY
SHREWSBURY
SY5 0XP
- Phone:
- 01743860488
- Email:
- sbean@sncanal.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window