SOUTHERN BROOKS COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Builds community spirit within Bradley Stoke, Patchway and neighbouring areas. SBCP currently work with children, young people, families and older people, strengthening communities. SBCP is involved in many initiatives, it now manages many services and supports many other local groups. Its work continues to be based on sound community development principles and values.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Total income:
£849,090
Donations and legacies | £687.24k | |
Charitable activities | £157.37k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £349 | |
Other | £4.13k |
Total expenditure:
£757,618
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £751.92k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.70k | |
Charitable expenditure | £751.92k | |
Retained for future use | £91.47k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 04 May 2001: Standard registration
- 17 July 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 July 2015: Funds transferred to 1157061 SOUTHERN BROOKS COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIPS
- PATCHWAY & BRADLEY STOKE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £843.68k | £706.53k | £657.15k | £541.96k | £849.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £832.77k | £548.69k | £803.67k | £545.65k | £757.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £641.13k | £774.17k | £480.88k | £391.42k | £687.24k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £202.54k | £64.86k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £176.21k | £149.87k | £157.37k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12 | £11 | £50 | £669 | £349 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.13k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £793.17k | £681.74k | £791.43k | £540.10k | £751.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.67k | £12.37k | £12.24k | £5.56k | £5.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £32.28k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £23.75k | £21.46k | £19.38k | £13.65k | £9.91k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £143.72k | £320.34k | £183.28k | £162.00k | £312.14k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£96.00k | -£96.00k | -£118.00k | -£95.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £25.68k | £41.08k | £48.47k | £25.15k | £80.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 08 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 12 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 19 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 19 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 19 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 19 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCTOBER 1997 AND AMENDED 14 NOVEMBER 2001, 14 NOVEMBER 2005 AND 16 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRADLEY STOKE AND PATCHWAY PARISHES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF ROLE, AGE, RACE, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, ABILITY OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. THE ORGANISATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
BRADLEY STOKE AND PATCHWAY PARISHES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window