THE RYCOTE BUILDINGS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration, preservation, repair, maintenance, improvement, beautification and reconstruction of Rycote Barn and of Rycote Chapel as a religious building of importance and of monuments, fittings, fixtures and glass in the Chapel and its wider churchyard. The paying of the stipend and expenses of an incumbent. Use of Barn and Chapel for other charitable purposes by local and national charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARCO COMPAGNONI | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
SARAH JANE TAYLOR | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Dr Henry Bernard Charles Taylor | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
MR JOHN MANSER CBE DL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
BERNARD JOHN TAYLOR CVO,CBE,DL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.03k | £35.59k | £10.96k | £24.68k | £20.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.06k | £23.53k | £21.22k | £29.06k | £26.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 MAY 2001
Charitable objects
(A) THE PRESERVATION RESTORATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF RYCOTE CHAPEL OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS (THE "CHAPEL") IN THE BENEFICE OF GREAT MILTON WITH LITTLE MILTON AND GREAT HASELEY IN THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD AS A RELIGIOUS BUILDING AND AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE AND ARCHITECTURAL VALUE AND OF MONUMENTS FITTINGS FIXTURES AND GLASS IN THE CHAPEL AND OF THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHAPEL; (B) THE PRESERVATION RESTORATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF RYCOTE BARN (A GRADE II LISTED BARN SITUATED 50 METRES SOUTH WEST OF RYCOTE ESTATE, OXFORDSHIRE) AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST; (C) PAYING OR AUGMENTING THE STIPEND OF THE INCUMBENT OF THE CHAPEL OR ANY OTHER PRIEST LICENSED TO SERVE IN THE CHAPEL AND DEFRAYING THE EXPENSES OF HIS OFFICE; AND (D) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS CLAUSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/OTHE ESTATE OFFICE
RYCOTE PARK
THAME
OXFORDSHIRE
OX9 2PE
- Phone:
- 01844210210
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window