Financial history THE SELSDON CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1087131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.77k £39.51k £48.18k £62.02k £46.44k
Total expenditure £72.46k £22.82k £59.95k £68.62k £86.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.50k £27.49k N/A £19.08k N/A