THE GARDEN MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(i) The advancement of education in all aspects of the study and teaching of gardening and its history (ii) The maintainance of the churchyard of St Mary at Lambeth as a garden/open space for the benefit of the general public (iii) The care of the church of St Mary at Lambeth; and to finance its use for charitable purposes for the benefit of the general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,357,899
Donations and legacies | £1.13m | |
Charitable activities | £551.11k | |
Other trading activities | £1.63m | |
Investments | £5.07k | |
Other | £38.76k |
Total expenditure:
£3,420,773
Raising funds | £1.52m | |
Charitable activities | £1.90m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.52m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.90m |
People

54 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 August 2001: Standard registration
- MUSEUM OF GARDEN HISTORY (Previous name)
- THE MUSEUM OF GARDEN HISTORY (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rupert David Tyler | Chair | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Charles Spicer | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Christopher Jason Gatenby | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Mary Ruffer | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Edwina Sassoon | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Bridget Pinchbeck | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Hazel Gardiner | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jeremy Clay | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Edward McMullan | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sir Charles Robert Saumarez Smith | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
Marchioness Of Normanby | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
BRYAN SANDERSON CBE | Trustee | 13 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
LADY JILL RIBLAT OBE | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||
LADY TANIA COMPTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
THOMAS STUART-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LADY CAROLINE EGREMONT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.94m | £2.12m | £3.40m | £2.87m | £3.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.17m | £1.74m | £2.66m | £3.11m | £3.42m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.83k | £136.00k | N/A | £6.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £405.93k | £1.48m | £1.94m | £936.11k | £1.13m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.07m | £465.26k | £1.09m | £1.38m | £1.63m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £460.29k | £172.57k | £367.02k | £555.81k | £551.11k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £98.27k | £81.60k | |
|
Income - Investment | £1 | £22 | £13 | £399 | £5.07k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £38.76k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £33.39k | £3.00k | £216.48k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.21m | £165.38k | £1.41m | £1.74m | £1.90m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £952.38k | £1.57m | £1.24m | £1.37m | £1.52m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £13.80k | £13.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £11.92k | £0 | £11.88k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.60m | £5.33m | £6.65m | £6.39m | £6.14m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £198.47k | £557.74k | £528.88k | £444.63k | £646.89k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.31m | £1.02m | £1.57m | £1.46m | £1.47m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 1979, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 APRIL 2001, 27 JULY 2001, 20 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 9 DECEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE STUDY AND TEACHING OF GARDENING AND ITS HISTORY; 2. THE REINSTATEMENT, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCHYARD OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN LAMBETH AND LAND ADJOINING OR ADJACENT THERETO AS A GARDEN OR OPEN SPACE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 3. THE REPAIR AND PRESERVATION OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN LAMBETH, AND TO FINANCE THE USE OF IT FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
LAMBETH, LONDON, AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Garden Museum
5 Lambeth Palace Road
LONDON
SE1 7LB
- Phone:
- 02074018865
- Email:
- info@gardenmuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window