THE BRIGHTSPACE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable, promote and demonstrate sustainable development within the county of Herefordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 27 August 2002: Standard registration
- THE BULMER FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Nancy Gwendoline Oakes | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
David Norman Bailey | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Read | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David William Sowerbutts | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.37k | £20.50k | £16.73k | £5.97k | £17.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.41k | £29.40k | £37.51k | £15.75k | £8.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 23 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 JULY 2002. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
IN THIS CLAUSE "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" AND "SUSTAINABLE METHODS" MEANS DEVELOPMENT AND METHODS RESPECTIVELY, THAT MEET THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT GENERATION WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. THE OBJECTS OF THE BULMER FOUNDATION SHALL BE (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN LAND AND ESTATE MANAGEMENT AND USE, SUSTAINABLE METHODS OF AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, SILVICULTURE AND ORGANIC FARMING. (B) TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO THE SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND ENVIRONMENTAL EFFECTS OF LAND AND ESTATE MANAGEMENT AND USE CONDUCTED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND SUSTAINABLE METHODS OF AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, SILVICULTURE AND ORGANIC FARMING AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (C) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS (I) THE CONSERVATION, AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT (II) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (III) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT (IV) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONGST THE YOUNG, THE UNEMPLOYED AND THOSE SUFFERING FROM OR RECOVERING FROM ADDICTION TO DRUGS, ALCOHOL OR ANY OTHER SUBSTANCE AND PROVIDING SUCH PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE (V) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE UNEMPLOYED IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS OR TO EXISTING BUSINESSES (VI) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND /OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS D) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR PURPOSE OR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR INSTITUTION AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE)
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEREFORD CIDER MUSEUM
THE CIDER MILLS
21 RYELANDS STREET
HEREFORD
HR4 0LW
- Phone:
- 01432378409
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window