STRATFORD RENAL UNIT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising and providing 'comfort' resources for dialysis patients above that normally provided by the NHS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 09 October 2002: Standard registration
- STRATFORD RENAL UNIT (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Charman | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick Graham Thomas Watson | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Lynne Smith | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
John Stuart Elliott | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
Jane Turney | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Burton | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Margaret Wheeler | Trustee | 09 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||
GERALD WHEELER | Trustee | 09 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||
CAROLINE WATSON | Trustee | 23 April 2009 |
|
|
||||||
MERCY TURNEY | Trustee | 31 August 2004 |
|
|
||||||
BARBARA CASSIDY | Trustee | 31 August 2004 |
|
|
||||||
TONY BIRD OBE | Trustee | 02 September 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.54k | £3.83k | £1.85k | £1.37k | £590 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.98k | £4.57k | £3.42k | £4.09k | £4.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 SEPTEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 8TH MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE:- THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM RENAL PROBLEMS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS PRIMARILY BY THE PROVISION OF: (1) ADVICE INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO SUCH PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS (2) EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE HEALTH AUTHORITY (3) FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH PATIENTS AND THEIR CARERS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHARNWOOD
10 Hillside Road
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 9EB
- Phone:
- 01789268954
- Email:
- Stratfordrut@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window