VERYAN PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sports/recreation Religious activities Community events Clubs/recreational events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 09 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Wilson | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Carol Ann Sherwood | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Webb | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Field | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|||||
SHANE TRENEARY | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN WALKER | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE CLARK | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIE JOHNS | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
LIN REES | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA LOHMANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORNA COUCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN EDITH Powell | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.51k | £41.61k | £19.35k | £34.28k | £11.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.22k | £14.84k | £21.12k | £64.16k | £6.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 July 2021 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 July 2021 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MAY 2001
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF VERYAN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF VERYAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
PENNARE WARTHA
VERYAN
TRURO
TR2 5PH
- Phone:
- 01872501886
- Email:
- wendyhopper01@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window