OFF THE RECORD COUNSELLING SERVICE (NORFOLK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our counsellors are experienced at working with a wide range of issues, including: relationships low self-esteem and self-confidence anxiety and panic attacks depression bereavement and loss work stress trauma and abuse issues adoption issues
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,680 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 September 2001: Standard registration
- OFF THE RECORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christina Mason | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Perry | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mollie Herron | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BURNETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.93k | £93.58k | £70.11k | £86.53k | £121.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.82k | £84.96k | £87.85k | £89.07k | £113.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.92k | £5.48k | £2.16k | £5.92k | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.53k | £5.19k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH APRIL 2000 AND AMENDED 8TH DEC 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF SPIRITUAL, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORTIVE HELP TO THOSE IN NEED THEREOF AND BY THE TRAINING OF INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH COUNSELLING AND SUPPORTIVE HELP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willow Lane House
9 Willow Lane
Norwich
NR2 1EU
- Phone:
- 01603626650
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window