THE AXBRIDGE & DISTRICT MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Axbridge & District Museum Trust run the museum known as 'King John's Hunting Lodge' in Axbridge. The Trust lease the building from the National Trust and operate with some membership funding from the National Trust with additional funds from admission charges, sales, donations and friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 15 March 2002: Standard registration
- 24 May 2023: Funds received from 272553 AXBRIDGE ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
- KING JOHNS HUNTING LODGE KING JOHNS HUNTING LODGE MUSEUM (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Morgan Hayes | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Gulliver | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Terence Rooke | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Paine | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew Scott McLeod | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leonard Hughes | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Trapp | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|||||
ALAN PETER WELLS | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS LIZ SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.91k | £28.15k | £15.99k | £14.07k | £28.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.96k | £14.16k | £17.38k | £20.96k | £23.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £3.57k | £3.57k | £3.57k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.40k | £22.11k | £1.40k | £1.40k | £1.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JUNE 2001 as amended on 17 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND CULTURE OF AXBRIDGE AND DISTRICT, BY THE MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SEDGEMOOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
Axbridge Town Hall
The Square
AXBRIDGE
Somerset
BS26 2AR
- Phone:
- 07586416837
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window