Financial history Inaura School

Charity Number: 1092152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.57m £1.60m £1.68m £1.56m £1.86m
Total expenditure £1.47m £1.58m £1.64m £1.57m £1.80m
Income from government contracts £1.57m £1.57m £1.68m £154.59k £1.85m
Income from government grants £3.96k £31.24k N/A £11.95k £8.13k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £31.24k £0 £11.95k £11.22k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.57m £1.57m £1.68m £1.55m £1.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £602 £1.49k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.47m £1.55m £1.64m £1.57m £1.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £28.96k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.57k £0 £0 £23.84k £16.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0