US IN A BUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We specialise in providing services for people who have profound learning disabilities and/or complex needs, can seem to be "difficult to reach" and all of whom find communication a challenge. The aim of our work is to create opportunities for people to fully express themselves. The therapeutic impact of this can be seen in people's increased confidence and willingness to engage with others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,235 from 6 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Kent
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 September 2001: Standard registration
- 20 July 2022: Funds received from 200667 EAST SURREY MENCAP
- US IN A BUS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Dadswell | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aleksandra Malanska | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Jackson | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth McRae | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Douglas John Bennett | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £425.17k | £400.06k | £283.77k | £289.49k | £303.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £419.80k | £337.27k | £251.31k | £303.92k | £315.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £38.76k | £6.94k | £22.12k | £17.41k | £13.24k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £156.21k | £32.03k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO HAVE SEVERE LEARNING AND/OR MULTIPLE DISABILITIES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (11) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION CONCERNING THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE WHO HAVE SEVERE LEARNING AND/OR MULTIPLE DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
US IN A BUS
Redhill Aerodrome Business Centre
Redhill Aerodrome
Kings Mill Lane
Redhill
RH1 5JZ
- Phone:
- 01737 823310
- Email:
- info@usinabus.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window