Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF MULANJE ORPHANS

Charity number: 1090727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 21 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 21 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 September 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 10 September 2024 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2021 25 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 25 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2020 08 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 08 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window