SOCIAL CARE INSTITUTE FOR EXCELLENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCIE improves the lives of people who use care services by sharing knowledge about what works. We are an independent charity working with social care and social work services across the UK. Our work helps to improve the knowledge and skills of those working in care services. People who use these services and their families also use our resources to make informed decisions about their care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,853,644
Donations and legacies | £1.80k | |
Charitable activities | £4.70m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £151.06k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,777,841
Raising funds | £55.44k | |
Charitable activities | £4.72m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £664,592 from 56 government contract(s) and £2,864,942 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £55.44k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.72m | |
Retained for future use | £75.80k |
People

48 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 03 July 2002: Standard registration
- SCIE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Right Honourable Paul Kenneth Burstow | Chair | 27 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Isaac Samuels | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Chimbani | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Hallam | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brett Terry | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Gould | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Grosvenor | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Margaret Lally | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Armitage | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sean Holland | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.25m | £4.63m | £4.79m | £4.48m | £4.85m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.21m | £5.26m | £4.31m | £4.18m | £4.78m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.10m | £1.36m | £1.84m | £422.22k | £664.59k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.28m | £3.10m | £2.48m | £2.36m | £2.86m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £15.00k | £20.81k | £11.60k | £1.80k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £1.51m | £2.29m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.24m | £3.10m | £2.48m | £4.42m | £4.70m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £49.45k | £151.06k | |
|
Income - Other | £12.43k | £318 | £861 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.21m | £2.78m | £1.70m | £4.13m | £4.72m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £10.90k | £50.95k | £54.99k | £55.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £27.76k | £27.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £2.78m | £1.70m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £2.47m | £2.55m | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £173.34k | £126.04k | £6.21k | £6.49k | £15.88k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.23m | £3.55m | £4.19m | £5.14m | £4.99m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£3.08m | -£3.63m | -£3.57m | -£58.33k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £629.47k | £1.20m | £1.02m | £744.25k | £586.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 19TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 7TH MAY 2002, 23 NOVEMBER 2003, 6 JULY 2006, 14 SEPTEMBER 2006 & 18 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JAN 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED ARISING FROM YOUTH, ILLNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE AND/OR POVERTY IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: 1 THE REVIEW, PROVISION AND DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE AND GUIDELINES FOR GOOD PRACTICE IN SOCIAL CARE; 2 UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND DELIVERING CONSULTANCY SERVICES AND TRAINING TO PERSONS WHO USE, WORK IN, OR ARE OTHERWISE INVOLVED IN SOCIAL CARE; 3 WORKING ACROSS THE INTERSECTION BETWEEN HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICES TO FACILITATE THE EFFECTIVE PLANNING AND PROVISION OF SOCIAL CARE; AND 4 TACKLING THE INEQUALITIES THAT EXIST WITHIN HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICES WITH THE AIM THAT ALL PEOPLE CAN LIVE IN THE PLACE THEY CALL HOME, WITH THE PEOPLE AND THINGS THEY LOVE, DOING WHAT MATTERS TO THEM, IN COMMUNITIES WHICH LOOK OUT FOR ONE ANOTHER; AND IN EACH CASE, WORKING WITHIN ENGLAND, SCOTLAND, WALES, NORTHERN IRELAND, THE CHANNEL ISLANDS, THE ISLE OF MAN AND/OR THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND; PROVIDED THAT IN SO DOING THE CHARITY SHALL NOT RELIEVE LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF THEIR STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Isosceles Finance Ltd
One
High Street
EGHAM
Surrey
TW20 9HJ
- Phone:
- 02038404040
- Email:
- info@scie.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window