THE WENTWORTH BARROW EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main source of income remains rent receivable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Rotherham
Governance
- 20 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR PHILIP NAYLOR-LEYLAND Bt. | Chair | 05 February 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||
ALEXANDER WILLIAM JAMES DAVIES-TERRY | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Linda Elizabeth Higgins | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
STEPHEN CLAPHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.02k | £10.61k | £7.80k | £11.59k | £15.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.62k | £8.15k | £27.81k | £12.12k | £11.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 December 2020 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME SEALED 23 JANUARY 1956
Charitable objects
(A) TO APPLY SUCH YEARLY SUM TOWARDS THE COSTS OF ALTERATIONS OF AND REPAIRS TO THE PREMISES OF SUCH AIDED SCHOOL ASSOCIATED WITH OR SITUATE WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE ESTATES BELONGING TO EARL FITZWILLIAM'S WENTWORTH ESTATES COMPANY SO THAT SUCH PREMISES MAY CONFORM TO THE REQUIREMENTS OF THE EDUCATION ACTS, 1944 TO 1953, AND THE REGULATIONS MADE THEREUNDER. (B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF BOYS AND GIRLS RESIDENT IN THE CIVIL OR ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WENTWORTH WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE THE SCHEME)
Area of benefit
THE CICVIL OR ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WENTWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
FITZWILLIAM (WENTWORTH) ESTATES
27 CLAYFIELDS LANE
WENTWORTH
ROTHERHAM
S62 7TD
- Phone:
- 01226742041
- Email:
- office@wentworthestate.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window