THE ART ROOM (OXFORD)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Art Room (Oxford) offers art as therapy to children and young people aged 5 to 16 who experience learning, behavioural, and other difficulties,as an addition to their daily school experience. The activities aim to raise children's self-esteem, self-confidence and independence, help modify behaviour which threatens their education and offer positive support in their overall development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 June 2019
Total income includes £23,540 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ealing
- Islington
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Oxfordshire
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 October 2001: Standard registration
- 04 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1040756 PLACE2BE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 04/06/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £924.53k | £970.21k | £794.91k | £922.00k | £497.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £968.25k | £1.02m | £1.06m | £543.00k | £1.00m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | £23.54k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £651.94k | £805.20k | £675.57k | £830.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £98.70k | £2.98k | £1.37k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £173.89k | £159.45k | £114.60k | £90.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £2.58k | £0 | £2.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £3.36k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £857.99k | £948.88k | £1.02m | £535.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £66.74k | £38.49k | £8.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.94k | £4.65k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 June 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 07 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 07 February 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 02 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 02 February 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/08/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ART-THERAPY IN A HIGHLY SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENT, FOR CHILDREN EXPERIENCING LEARNING, BEHAVIOURAL, AND OTHER DIFFICULTIES, AS AN ADDITION TO THEIR DAILY SCHOOL EXPERIENCE . THE CHARITY'S ACTIVITIES ARE DESIGNED TO: RAISE CHILDREN'S SELF ESTEEM, SELF-CONFIDENCE AND INDEPENDENCE. HELP CHILDREN MODIFY THE BEHAVIOUR WHICH THREATENS THEIR EDUCATION. OFFER POSITIVE SUPPORT IN A CHILD'S OVERALL DEVELOPMENT, AND ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT OF LIFE SKILLS. REDUCE THE LIKELIHOOD OF EXCLUSION FROM SCHOOL. ENABLE CHILDREN TO FULLY ENGAGE IN THEIR SCHOOL. REDUCE THE LIKELIHOOD OF EXCLUSION FROM SCHOOL. ENABLE CHILDREN TO FULLY ENGAGE IN THEIR SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window