NORTHUMBERLAND MASONIC CHARITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NMCA is primarily a fundraising appeal fund for all freemasons in the Masonic Province of Northumberland. Each year one or more masonic provinces are nominated by The Grand Charity of the United Grand Lodge of England to host a Festival in aid of a designated charity. The Province of Northumberland was nominated to host a Festival in 2020 in aid of the Royal Masonic Benevolent Institution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 18 October 2002: Standard registration
- THE NMCA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN JAMES CRAIGS | Chair | 29 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Richard Winship | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
John Nigel Bruce | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
KEVIN PETER STANNARD | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
STUART CAIRNS | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Peter Maurice Smith | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
IAN MICHAEL GILBERG FCIS | Trustee | 29 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
MATTHEW DAVID EDWARD AULD | Trustee | 07 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||
GARNET DUFF BURTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
COLIN HUME | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £319.42k | £228.86k | £242.28k | £319.55k | £209.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £411.23k | £283.62k | £178.15k | £290.61k | £287.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN LAW AND IN PARTICULAR TO DO SO BY MAKING GRANTS TO MASONIC INSTITUTIONS WHILE THEY REMAIN ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES, OR TO ANY OTHER ORGANISATION ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Prov Grand Lodge of Northumberland
17 Lansdowne Terrace
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 1HP
- Phone:
- 01912136990
- Email:
- PROVSEC@PGLN.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window