Financial history GLOBAL CANOPY

Charity number: 1089110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.24m £2.36m £4.49m £5.16m £7.05m
Total expenditure £2.16m £2.53m £3.39m £4.59m £5.84m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £592.52k £686.89k £948.99k £682.80k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £390.70k £414.16k £727.67k £1.02m £1.17m
Income - Other trading activities £11.27k £7.68k £5.84k £7.81k £10.13k
Income - Charitable activities £1.84m £1.94m £3.76m £4.14m £5.86m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £21 £8 £0 £1.09k £11.79k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.04m £2.41m £3.26m £4.39m £5.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £114.48k £110.72k £117.16k £186.25k £197.86k
Expenditure - Governance £12.47k £7.43k £426 £1.85k £1.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £261.71k £190.71k £300.72k £462.04k £1.11m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £11.78k £7.76k £8.27k £12.00k £12.63k