THE VAIL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1089579
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charities objects are to maintain, support or contribute towards such one or more exclusively charitable purposes or charitable companies, institutions, associations, trusts or societies in the United Kingdom or elsewhere in the world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £98,288
Total expenditure: £4,066,968

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 2001: Standard registration
  • 18 November 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 18 November 2022: Funds transferred to 1099682 PRISM THE GIFT FUND
  • 18 November 2022: Funds transferred to 1105998 KKL CHARITY ACCOUNTS
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 31/03/2021
Total gross income £631.08k £304.29k £469.33k £87.12k £98.29k
Total expenditure £1.20m £1.35m £1.08m £521.98k £4.07m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £510.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £121.08k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.14m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £16.99k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.12m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £56.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 February 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 February 2022 18 days late
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2018 10 July 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 10 July 2019 On Time