CROSSPOOL COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ofsted registered provider of sessional day-care providing lunch time club for children aged 2 and 4. Operating Monday-Friday during school term time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £111,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 05 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Turner | Chair | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Anson | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
kimberley wellbank | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
michelle vesey | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bradley Hulley | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yisha Jackson | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stevie Louise Hanson | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Blanche Brindle | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nea Maycock | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.58k | £115.36k | £119.16k | £123.64k | £112.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.60k | £102.04k | £107.01k | £93.59k | £116.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £111.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/06/2000 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lydgate Infant School
Lydgate Lane
Sheffield
S10 5FQ
- Phone:
- 07432658057
- Email:
- ccpre1@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window