Trustees CROSSPOOL COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1090433

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Turner | Chair | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Anson | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
kimberley wellbank | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
michelle vesey | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bradley Hulley | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yisha Jackson | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stevie Louise Hanson | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Blanche Brindle | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nea Maycock | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.