THE KERRY HILL FLOCK BOOK SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Kerry Hill Sheep breed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Kewley | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Elaine Wilkin | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|||||
James Edward Wallace McClintock | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Fisher | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY ANDREW WARD | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Gareth David Huw Richards | Trustee | 12 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Willan | Trustee | 12 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Adamson | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Sion Jones | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elisabeth Macleod | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edgar Symonds | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
GWILYM PUGH | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATIE ROSE ESLER | Trustee | 05 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN OWENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JIM ROWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA BARNARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.72k | £35.03k | £38.67k | £42.35k | £44.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.14k | £17.84k | £24.17k | £23.73k | £39.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 15 September 2023 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 NOVEMBER 1972 AS AMENDED ON 16 NOVEMBER 2002 as amended on 12 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE BREED OF SHEEP KNOWN AS THE KERRY HILL BREED, TO MAINTAIN THE PURITY AND TO ENCOURAGE THE IMPROVEMENT AND EXPANSION OF THE BREED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Stables
Stapleton Grange
ANNAN
DG12 6RG
- Phone:
- 01461 701045
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window