ROSETTA LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) To offer a creative opportunity to those living with life-limiting illness (participants) that enables them to tell their stories in whatever form is appropriate to their needs b) To advance participant rehabilitation by offering creative initiatives that restore confidence & self-esteem. c) To present performances & screenings that bring the stories of participants to the wider community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,940 from 1 government contract(s) and £20,155 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 28 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Denise Stanley-Chard | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Pauline Boye | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Nicholas Steven Ward | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Gareth Jones | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Olivia Dix | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Sarah bazin | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.07k | £182.69k | £254.26k | £247.13k | £201.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.32k | £163.90k | £237.56k | £222.48k | £197.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £29.94k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £30.44k | £5.48k | £20.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 15TH MARCH 1999 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18TH FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF TERMINALLY ILL PEOPLE BY PROVIDING A CREATIVE SERVICE WHICH ENABLES THEM TO DOCUMENT THEIR LIVES IN WHATEVER FORM IS APPROPRIATE TO EACH INDIVIDUAL'S CREATIVE AND PSYCHOLOGICAL NEEDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Brook End
Chadlington
Chipping Norton
OX7 3NF
- Phone:
- 01608676662
- Email:
- info@rosettalife.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window