THE SOUTHERN WILDLIFE CARE AND ADVISORY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue, care and rehabilitation of injured, orphaned, sick and distressed wild animals. Promoting an interest and respect of our natural wildlife heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- THE FOLLY WILDLIFE RESCUE TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Johnson | Chair | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Chandler | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Hall | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Cater | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn White | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ALEXANDRA NUNN | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA REDDY | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £297.39k | £324.00k | £472.54k | £324.39k | £364.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.23k | £290.18k | £337.50k | £316.14k | £350.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE ON 26 MARCH, 2002.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF SICK ANIMALS BY (A) RESCUING, CARING FOR AND REHABILITATING INJURED, ORPHANED OR DISTRESSED WILDLIFE (B) PROVIDING AN ADVICE AND HELPLINE; AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE CARE OF WILDLIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Broadwater Forest Wildlife Hospital
Fairview Lane
Broadwater Forest
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Kent
TN3 9LU
- Phone:
- 01892543213
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window