PRO-CONTACT EXPERT SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pro-Contact works with children and parents in separated families. Services include court assessments, therapy, supervised direct and indirect contact, assisted contact, parenting programmes and mediation/negotiation around issues of contact and residence. Pro-Contact works to improve the lives of children in NW England and beyond by reducing conflict and supporting relationships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- PRO-CONTACT (Working name)
- GREATER MANCHESTER CHILDREN'S SUPERVISED CONTACT AND ASSESSMENT CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE GREATER MANCHESTER SUPERVISED CHILDRENS CONTACT CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.10k | £461.61k | £559.48k | £325.77k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £414.12k | £415.63k | £561.67k | £358.61k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £863 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £557.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £1.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £557.03k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £4.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 22 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | 01 September 2015 | 398 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 16 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 17 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 13 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 17 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JANUARY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14/2/02, 12/11/03, AND 14/09/09. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 27/11/03 AND 14/09/09 AND 24/09/09
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED TO CHILDREN BY THE BREAKDOWN OF FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF SUCH CHILDREN WHO ARE (PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) LIVING IN THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF A RANGE OF INTERVENTIONS AND ASSESSMENTS ON BEHALF OF FAMILIES IN COURT PROCEEDINGS OR IN THE COMMUNITY, AND OTHER PROFESSIONAL AGENDAS; AND (B) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR PROFESSIONAL AND VOLUNTARY WORKERS AND OTHERS INVOLVED IN FAMILY INTERVENTION AND ASSESSMENT; AND (C) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF SUPERVISED CONTACT FACILITIES WHERE CHILDREN CAN MEET ONE OR BOTH PARENTS AND/OR OTHER ESTRANGED FAMILY MEMBERS IN A COMFORTABLE SAFE ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window