OPERATION SMILE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1091316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Operation Smile is an international volunteer based medical services charity providing free reconstructive surgery and aftercare to children and young adults around the world, primarily for cleft lips and/or palates. In the UK, we raise funds to treat facial deformities, recruit and supply medical volunteers, help train local medical teams/build infrastructure & public raise awareness.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Bolivia
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Ethiopia
  • Ghana
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Morocco
  • Mozambique
  • Peru
  • Philippines

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 2002: Standard registration
  • 12 April 2021: Funds received from 1178765 CAMSMILE (CAMBRIDGE SMILE)
  • 15 November 2022: Funds received from 515204 WREXHAM AND DISTRICT PHAB CLUB
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Jaques Chair 26 September 2024
None on record
Ingrid Natalie Cope Trustee 26 March 2025
None on record
Michelle Futter Trustee 26 March 2025
None on record
Judy Kathambi Nyaga Trustee 02 January 2024
None on record
Saqib Alam Trustee 02 January 2024
None on record
Diana Elizabeth Dalton Trustee 02 January 2024
None on record
Christopher John Pinnington Trustee 09 November 2017
None on record
Dr William Preston Magee Trustee 03 July 2014
None on record
MR PHIL MCDONALD Trustee 05 November 2001
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.77m £6.17m £6.72m £7.47m £7.15m
Total expenditure £3.28m £5.30m £5.90m £7.82m £7.81m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.11k £5.55k £5.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.64m £3.95m £6.59m £7.29m £6.94m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £97.99k £109.82k £123.49k £181.89k £159.53k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £30.30k £800 £3.58k £18.85k £49.43k
Income - Other £0 £2.12m £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £497.08k £368.11k £701.27k £683.07k £838.08k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.54m £3.35m £2.66m £4.31m £4.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.74m £1.95m £3.24m £3.51m £3.73m
Expenditure - Governance £22.73k £12.25k £45.46k £42.46k £99.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £36.11k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £31.12k £17.95k £13.48k £17.87k £22.23k
Long-term investments £16.94k £22.72k £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.25m £3.08m £4.04m £3.81m £3.07m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £243.11k £181.02k £298.57k £419.94k £348.90k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 19 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 19 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 15 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 15 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 03 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 03 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 05 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Operation Smile Uk
Unit A
Genoa House
Juniper Drive
LONDON
SW18 1FY
Phone:
02034755126