Accounts and annual returns AGE CONCERN EAST CHESHIRE

Charity Number: 1090161
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 19 May 2025 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 19 May 2025 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late Download Open in new window