Financial history AGE CONCERN EAST CHESHIRE

Charity Number: 1090161
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.14m £1.03m £967.73k £913.97k £1.19m
Total expenditure £1.10m £894.86k £965.67k £1.04m £1.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £25.84k
Income from government grants £5.21k £104.08k £11.41k N/A £1
Income - Donations and legacies £51.33k £168.34k £81.72k £36.67k £50.42k
Income - Other trading activities £630.25k £438.40k £531.96k £511.38k £594.83k
Income - Charitable activities £448.51k £319.04k £342.35k £365.18k £541.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £311 £460 £289 £740 £965
Income - Other £5.21k £104.08k £11.41k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £25.54k £0 £42.61k £1.80k £32.26k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £509.45k £438.25k £462.93k £469.83k £650.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds £591.59k £456.61k £502.74k £570.45k £650.08k
Expenditure - Governance £5.48k £5.73k £10.06k £11.70k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0