Financial history STEP BY STEP SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1091258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.16m £2.35m £2.33m £2.27m £2.68m
Total expenditure £1.96m £2.03m £2.14m £2.20m £2.37m
Income from government contracts £1.98m £2.13m £2.17m £2.17m £2.58m
Income from government grants N/A £50.54k £29.07k £1.68k £4.31k
Income - Donations and legacies £61.23k £184.80k £51.99k £19.80k £18.20k
Income - Other trading activities £8.96k £5.89k £5.86k £19.07k £27.00k
Income - Charitable activities £2.08m £2.16m £2.27m £2.20m £2.58m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.80k £6.28k £7.80k £25.45k £50.62k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.94m £2.02m £2.14m £2.19m £2.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.67k £1.06k £3.32k £4.84k £910
Expenditure - Governance £0 £29.58k £28.66k £0 £28.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0