Canterbury District Volunteer Centre LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Canterbury and Herne Bay Volunteer Centre promotes and develops volunteering within the Canterbury District in all its many facets including both the support of volunteers and organisations who utilise volunteers. We also undertake projects, utilising volunteers, for the benefit of the local community and responding to local need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 15 February 2002: Standard registration
- CANTERBURY AND HERNE BAY VOLUNTEER CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- CANTERBURY VOLUNTEER CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr HUW RHYS CLEVERLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
Adrian Williams | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Gillian Rosemary Ball | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Bernard ALAN ROBERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
Hilary Janet Adams | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.61k | £128.54k | £97.17k | £93.31k | £91.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.79k | £98.86k | £91.12k | £91.43k | £130.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £8.81k | £8.81k | £8.81k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.63k | £26.12k | £10.00k | £3.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 12TH MARCH 2001, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28TH JUNE 2004. as amended on 25 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER VOLUNTEERS AND ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROTECT HEALTH, RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
CANTERBURY, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
CanterburyDistrictVolunteerCentre
Bradbury Wellbeing Centre
16 Reculver Road
HERNE BAY
Kent
CT6 6LE
- Phone:
- 01227452278
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window