THE BRITISH RENAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in the subject areas of renal disease & renal replacement therapy in the U.K. To run symposia for the discussion & dissemination of knowledge of renal care. To create a multi-professional group to monitor, maintain & improve standards of care & comfort to those suffering from renal disease. To provide funding for patient-centred research projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 March 2002: Standard registration
- 06 July 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 06 July 2021: Funds transferred to 800733 THE RENAL ASSOCIATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £622.41k | £366.44k | £688.48k | £735.64k | £252.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £458.71k | £422.87k | £631.08k | £666.61k | £670.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.17k | N/A | £320 | £1.16k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £573.36k | N/A | £688.09k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £47.85k | N/A | £0 | £734.32k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £36 | N/A | £0 | £157 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £458.71k | N/A | £0 | £515.43k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £631.08k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £800 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £151.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 88 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 30 August 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 18 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2017
(These accounts |
18 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 10TH JULY 2001 as amended on 17 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT AREAS OF RENAL DISEASE AND RENAL REPLACEMENT THERAPY (RENAL CARE) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM 2) THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM RENAL DISEASE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window