Financial history HELP FOR HEALTH

Charity Number: 1091814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £117.48k £227.47k £27.61k £54.08k £103.50k
Total expenditure £138.65k £135.41k £216.50k £154.71k £188.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A