Financial history PLAYCARE LAMBETH

Charity number: 1096122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.00k £0 £5.00k £3.98k £2.01k
Total expenditure £60 £4.39k £696 £5.05k £4.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A