WORCESTER OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The performance of three full-scale musical productions per annum in local theatres and other smaller scale musical and dramatic works in other venues in the Worcester area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 08 April 2002: Standard registration
- WODS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS HOLLOWAY BA QTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||
Andrew David Hopkins | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
David Joseph Skelton | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ethan Cook | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Toby Daniel Edwards | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Abbi Jakeman | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sarah Elizabeth Gilhooly | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr MICHAEL ASTLES | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lyndsay Berryman | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jeremy Paul Field | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Christopher Hooper | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rachel Price | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.71k | £30.56k | £39.45k | £108.96k | £119.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.49k | £13.35k | £27.18k | £120.00k | £122.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 2001, AS AMENDED 30 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
421 Astwood Road
WORCESTER
WR3 8HB
- Phone:
- 07980056615
- Email:
- info@wods.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window