DIVYA SHANTHI MISSION SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty, sickness & distress & to advance the education of children of the Divya Shanthi School & other residential children's Christian homes in Bangalore & South India. To support the charitable work of Divya Shanthi Christian in Bangalore & South India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Cambridgeshire
- Leeds City
- Oxfordshire
- India
Governance
- 12 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE BURD | Chair | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ROSALIE DAVIS | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Judith Margaret Piggott | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Paul David Luke | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
TESSA HENNESSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS ALI LUKE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.81k | £89.49k | £114.39k | £88.51k | £85.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.25k | £105.95k | £114.44k | £100.36k | £70.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 22 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND DISTRESS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AT THE DYVYA SHANTHI SCHOOL IN BANGALORE AND OTHER RESIDENTIAL CHRISTIAN HOMES IN BANGALORE AND SOUTH INDIA. (B) TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORD OF DIVYA SHANTHI CHRISTIAN MINISTRY AND OTHER CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS IN BANGLAORE AND SOUTH INDIA.
Area of benefit
CHILDREN AT THE DYVYA SHANTHI SCHOOL IN BANGALORE AND OTHER RESIDENTIAL CHRISTIAN HOMES IN BANGALORE AND SOUTH INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 LITTLE ACREAGE
MARSTON
OXFORD
OX3 0PS
- Phone:
- 01132865015
- Email:
- info@dsms.org.uk
- Website:
-
dsms.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window