THE COMFREY PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Comfrey Project provides facilities that improve life and the general well-being of refugees and people seeking asylum. A safe, welcoming environment promotes personal well-being through a sense of place and belonging. Various shared creative activities, centred around gardening and nature, includes cooking and crafts. We offer a chance to be active, socialise and learn about other cultures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £10,000 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 09 August 2002: Standard registration
- 29 November 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 November 2018: Funds transferred to 1175224 THE COMFREY PROJECT CIO
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.51k | £72.93k | £82.17k | £117.60k | £84.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.13k | £105.13k | £94.07k | £95.71k | £99.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £10.00k | £3.41k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 02 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 02 November 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 11 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 11 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 21 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 21 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND GENERAL WELL-BEING, PRIMARILY THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HORTICULTURAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window