Financial history THE COLDSTREAM GUARDS COMMON INVESTMENT FUND

Charity number: 1091674
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £154.14k £159.64k £134.60k £135.26k £191.04k
Total expenditure £187.03k £36.84k £34.22k £31.98k £3.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A