Governing document THE COLDSTREAM GUARDS COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity number: 1091674
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 9 JUNE 1964, AMENDED SCHEME OF 17 MAY 1991, 28 APRIL 1998, ORDER OF 8 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
A COMMON INVESTMENT FUND ESTABLISHED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF THE 9TH JUNE 1964 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHARITIES AFFECTED BY THE SAID SCHEME.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ARMED FORCES NATIONAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.