Financial history WORTHING CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1093113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £28.36k £5.81k £13.64k £17.46k £21.70k
Total expenditure £14.09k £8.81k £19.82k £15.29k £15.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.24k N/A N/A N/A £2.52k