Trustees WORTHING CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1093113

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tamsin Jane Cundy | Chair | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Tanner | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Hawkins | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Lois Fearman | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Jane Burcombe | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Mary Crockett | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Dr Peter George Bernard Johnston | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|||||||
BARRY PHILIP BATES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
FIONA CLAIRE CRANE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.